Trustees BISHOP SETH WARD ALMSHOUSE TRUST
Charity number: 240885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Dobner | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Sheppard | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aubrey Holt | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kay Newland | Trustee | 09 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jon Paterson | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Handy | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Colin Edward Wilson | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Hibberd | Trustee | 03 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Michelle Hume | Trustee | 03 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Dobner | Trustee | 22 March 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.