Financial history THE CHARITY OF DR JONES

Charity number: 241351
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £51.20k £44.79k £45.08k £41.38k £46.72k
Total expenditure £24.80k £11.09k £39.97k £40.88k £8.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A