WOKING MOSQUE FUND AND SIR SALAR JUNG MEMORIAL HOUSE

Charity number: 241402
Charity reporting is overdue by 19 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £218.35k £246.72k £240.66k £256.24k £251.90k
Total expenditure £166.33k £320.39k £253.95k £261.22k £272.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A