THE GRANADA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 241693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £35.73k £31.14k £32.96k £40.97k £34.35k
Total expenditure £220.11k £347.07k £149.01k £90.29k £238.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A