CHARITY OF MARIANO FERNANDEZ

Charity number: 242066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 December 2021 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 March 2020 126 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 November 2018 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 December 2017 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required