CHARITY OF MARIANO FERNANDEZ

Charity number: 242066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.11k £4.03k £3.02k £3.73k £5.74k
Total expenditure £6.50k £4.39k £14.29k £4.06k £4.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A