THE MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 242101
Charity reporting is overdue by 669 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £13.93k £13.47k £13.78k £14.25k £14.96k
Total expenditure £15.49k £17.71k £16.89k £14.68k £18.09k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 £0