BRAMPTON TRUST

Charity number: 242326
Charity reporting is up to date (88 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £207.52k £230.19k £267.66k £268.74k £267.14k
Total expenditure £138.40k £137.88k £306.18k £250.44k £198.28k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A