Governance UNITED SYNAGOGUE
Charity number: 242552

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 02 June 1965: Standard registration
- 26 June 2012: Funds received from 296057 THE UNITED SYNAGOGUE KASHRUT BOARD
- 25 October 2013: Funds received from 242552-13 THE BETH HAMMIDRASH HOUSE OF LEARNING (FORMERLY KN...
- 13 November 2013: Funds received from 242552-59 ABRAHAM LYON MOSES NO 2
- 13 November 2013: Funds received from 242552-58 ABRAHAM LYON MOSES NO 1
- 13 November 2013: Funds received from 242552-24 SAMUEL DE FALK'S CHARITIES
- 13 November 2013: Funds received from 242552-16 MEMBERS' BENEVOLENT FUND
- 26 November 2017: Funds received from 1147276 KINLOSS EDUCATIONAL TRUST
- 26 October 2018: Funds received from 286670 THE HAMPSTEAD ANNIVERSARY FUND
- 13 November 2018: Funds received from 1099735 KINGSTON SURBITON & DISTRICT SYNAGOGUE TRUST
- 15 November 2018: Funds received from 1099114 HADLEY WOOD JEWISH COMMUNITY LIMITED
- 11 April 2019: Funds received from 281244 EDGWARE CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.