OXFORD AND DISTRICT CLUB FOR THE HARD OF HEARING

Charity number: 242702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £896 £897 £894 £1.92k £260
Total expenditure £455 £417 £548 £1.19k £698
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A