CONNAHS QUAY OLD PEOPLES' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 243148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.43k £3.87k £8.07k £7.17k £8.02k
Total expenditure £4.09k £5.49k £7.45k £7.05k £6.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A