WYTHALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 243332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £273.58k £273.67k £249.26k £250.51k £212.13k
Total expenditure £280.68k £286.85k £266.32k £256.46k £197.94k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £34.00k £20.43k £4.60k £102.22k