THE CHARITY OF THE REVD GEORGE WALLS, D D

Charity number: 243406
Charity reporting is overdue by 548 days
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 02/08/2014 02/08/2015 02/08/2016 02/08/2017 02/08/2018
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A