MAHARASHTRA MANDAL LONDON

Charity number: 243443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £56.61k £123.32k £48.69k £43.07k £26.54k
Total expenditure £48.99k £93.38k £58.80k £62.87k £10.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A