HADLEY OLD PEOPLESREST ROOM COMMITTEE

Charity number: 243812
Charity reporting is overdue by 300 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 300 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 300 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 October 2021 629 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 October 2021 992 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 October 2021 1356 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 February 2017 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required