BIRMINGHAM CHURCHES TOGETHER

Charity number: 243931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Prebendary Jennifer Clare Tomlinson Trustee 09 June 2021
BIRMINGHAM DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
THE BIRMINGHAM DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
THE CHANCE TRUST Received: On time
THE BISHOP OF BIRMINGHAM Trustee
SANDWELL CHURCHES LINK Received: On time
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF LADY KATHERINE LEVESON Received: On time
CHURCH COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND Received: On time
THE FOUNDATION OF LADY KATHERINE LEVESON Received: On time
HARRISON-ROGERS-LOZO FOUNDATION Received: On time
Katarzyna Jolliffe Trustee 30 October 2019 None on record
Mauricio Silva Trustee 01 May 2018
FAITH ENCOUNTER PROGRAMME Received: On time
Rev DAVID EMANUEL ELLIS Trustee 20 October 2020
CHURCHES AND INDUSTRY GROUP BIRMINGHAM-SOLIHULL Received: 4 days late
The Most Reverend Bernard Longley Trustee
CATHOLIC TRUST FOR ENGLAND AND WALES Received: On time
THE BRITISH TRUST FOR THE ECUMENICAL INSTITUTE FOR ADVANCED THEOLOGICAL STUDY IN JERUSALEM Received: On time
THE VALLADOLID TRUST FUND Received: On time
THE VENERABLE ENGLISH COLLEGE TRUST Received: On time
BIRMINGHAM DIOCESAN TRUST Received: On time
MATER ECCLESIAE COLLEGE Received: On time
MARYVALE INSTITUTE Received: On time
NEWMAN UNIVERSITY Received: On time
Rev IAN HOWARTH Trustee 09 June 2015
KATHRYN'S MERCY HOME TRUST (UK) Received: On time
BIRMINGHAM DISTRICT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH IN GREAT BRITAIN Received: On time
REV STEVEN MARK FABER Trustee 08 June 2016
THE UNITED REFORMED CHURCH (WEST MIDLANDS) TRUST LIMITED Received: On time