ACKLETON VILLAGE HALL ALSO KNOWN AS ACKLETON MISSION ROOM 2. TRUST FUND IN CONNEXION WITH ACKLETON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 244010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £197 £174 £134 £91 £0
Total expenditure £1.12k £1.44k £2.04k £3.23k £2.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A