THE TOWN LANDS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 244143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 June 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 24 June 2020 06 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 24 June 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 24 June 2018 19 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 24 June 2017 15 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2017 Not Required