THE TOWN LANDS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 244143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 24/06/2017 24/06/2018 24/06/2019 24/06/2020 24/06/2021
Total gross income £336 £381 £300 £815 £388
Total expenditure £336 £381 £0 £409 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A