HIGHLAND SOCIETY OF LONDON

Charity number: 244472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
George Harry Nickerson Trustee 14 March 2019 None on record
NEILL MULVIE Trustee 20 November 2014 None on record
MR NAT HONE Trustee
THE HONE FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
THE ASHBY ELMS SCHOOL TRUST Received: On time
THE HEREFORD CATHEDRAL PERPETUAL TRUST Received: On time
BOSBURY PARISH HALL Received: 11 days late
THE VISCOUNT YOUNGER OF LECKIE Trustee None on record
LORD CALUM IAN GRAHAM Trustee None on record
FIONA MACPHERSON Trustee 04 November 2020 None on record
DUNCAN BYATT Chair 02 April 2013 None on record
ALASDAIR FINDLAY-SHIRRAS Trustee 07 November 2018 None on record
TOM MACPHERSON Trustee 29 November 2016 None on record
MR ALEX OGILVIE Trustee 28 March 2011 None on record