THE LLANGRISTIOLUS AND DISTRICT CLUB FOR THE AGED

Charity number: 244775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.03k £2.26k £3.24k £1.76k £11.72k
Total expenditure £1.04k £3.75k £1.86k £1.41k £10.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £517