THE LLANGRISTIOLUS AND DISTRICT CLUB FOR THE AGED

Charity number: 244775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruth Ellis Gilford Trustee 17 June 2021 None on record
CATHERINE ELLIS HUGHES Trustee None on record
ANGELA BENNETT Trustee 09 October 2007 None on record
MARGARET ROBERTS Trustee None on record
JANE WILLIAMS Trustee None on record
John Hughes Trustee 08 December 2016 None on record
SIONED W WILLIAMS Trustee 05 June 1990 None on record
Sian Parry Trustee 05 April 2017 None on record
BRIAN OWEN Trustee None on record
DAVID GARETH WILLIAMS Chair None on record
Dafydd Roberts Trustee 20 September 2019
CWMNI CYNNAL Received: On time
Ann Hughes Trustee 08 December 2016 None on record