Accounts and annual returns BROADWELL WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 245134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 03 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 16 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 17 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required