Financial history BROADWELL WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 245134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £9.35k £10.17k £21.92k £17.22k £984
Total expenditure £5.24k £5.22k £20.42k £4.20k £5.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A