CATHOLIC APOSTOLIC CHURCH - TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION THEREWITH

Charity number: 245250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 16 October 2017 On time Download