THE CHRISTIAN ALLIANCE OF WOMEN AND GIRLS - ENFIELD BRANCH

Charity number: 245773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.00k £13.00k £12.84k £14.02k £14.32k
Total expenditure £15.02k £15.02k £12.87k £14.29k £12.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £200 £200 £0 £250 £200