Trustees DEDHAM VALE SOCIETY
Charity number: 246007
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES CLOVER | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||
Marian Frances Nicholls | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Anne Brown | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
William Shearer | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Katherine Warburton | Trustee | 11 January 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
Paul Gallifant | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
Adam Sedgwick | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
ROBERT FELIX ERITH TD DL | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
PENELOPE PROBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
JOHN OSBORN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.