Financial history THE REVEREND DOCTOR GEORGE RICHARDS' CHARITY FOR POOR CLERGYMEN

Charity number: 246965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £24.24k £25.21k £26.20k £22.91k £53.50k
Total expenditure £19.92k £25.71k £18.91k £12.21k £44.36k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A