Accounts and annual returns THE REVEREND DOCTOR GEORGE RICHARDS' CHARITY FOR POOR CLERGYMEN

Charity number: 246965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 July 2020 On time
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required