Financial history ABBEYFIELD (CHELSEA AND FULHAM) SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 246993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £270.22k £231.27k £269.15k £252.11k £235.46k
Total expenditure £134.50k £192.33k £142.84k £148.89k £178.54k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A