HALSWAY MANOR SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 247230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £743.89k £894.74k £1.01m £1.33m £1.01m
Total expenditure £748.51k £750.75k £863.72k £854.20k £842.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £31.60k
Income - Donations and legacies £51.68k £172.60k £198.10k £493.44k £139.19k
Income - Other trading activities £58.82k £63.92k £66.03k £55.02k £62.94k
Income - Charitable activities £628.21k £654.76k £738.40k £781.23k £797.93k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £92 £2.29k £627 £1.25k £6.48k
Income - Other £5.09k £1.18k £2.43k £2.89k £4
Income - Legacies £2.56k £149.11k £10.00k £16.62k £12.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £696.31k £694.20k £801.79k £805.01k £790.57k
Expenditure - Raising funds £52.20k £56.55k £61.93k £49.20k £52.16k
Expenditure - Governance £4.47k £4.47k £0 £6.28k £5.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0