Financial history FEDERATION OF OLD CORNWALL SOCIETIES

Charity number: 247283
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £4.64k £12.44k £136.37k £7.20k £6.46k
Total expenditure £3.82k £8.81k £8.34k £3.83k £19.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A