ALLOTMENT AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY

Charity number: 247364
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.07k £1.96k £2.04k £2.02k £2.22k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £5.06k £236
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A