THE RICHARD DIMBLEBY CANCER FUND

Charity number: 247558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hamish Warren Sinclair Trustee 16 June 2016 None on record
Kyle Gregory Taylor Trustee 24 October 2013 None on record
Elizabeth Anne Price Trustee 18 March 2020 None on record
Frederick Thomas Jordan Dimbleby Trustee 05 March 2020 None on record
Patricia Rosario Brolly Trustee 05 August 2021 None on record
Anand David Purushotham Trustee 26 November 2020 None on record
Joanna Margaret Ralling Trustee 18 December 2012 None on record
JONATHAN DIMBLEBY Chair None on record
Helen Boaden Trustee 25 May 2017
THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF ARTS Received: On time
OUT OF JOINT Received: 3 days late
THE WINDSOR LEADERSHIP TRUST Received: On time