Financial history NORTHUMBERLAND AND NEWCASTLE SOCIETY

Charity number: 247885
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £23.15k £27.21k £49.84k £22.84k £49.97k
Total expenditure £18.72k £25.31k £36.77k £22.58k £64.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A