WAKEFIELD HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 248363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.80k £4.70k £2.62k £4.16k £1.04k
Total expenditure £2.12k £3.62k £2.22k £2.81k £5.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A