Trustees WAKEFIELD HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 248363
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS PAM JUDKINS Chair
None on record
RICHARD KNOWLES Trustee 14 March 2018
None on record
Jody Ineson Trustee 08 March 2017
None on record
LORRAINE SIMPSON Trustee 11 March 2015
None on record
MARY JOSEPHINE HERON Trustee 24 August 2012
None on record
DR PHILLIP EDWARD JUDKINS Trustee 06 October 2011
COMMUNICATIONS AND ELECTRONICS MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
PURBECK RADAR MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID SCRIVEN Trustee 06 October 2011
None on record
BRIAN THOMAS Trustee 06 October 2011
None on record
MRS LESLEY TAYLOR Trustee
THE GISSING TRUST
Received: On time
SHIRLEY LEVON Trustee
None on record