Financial history OCTAGON THEATRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 248833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.04m £3.67m £2.34m £1.95m £2.63m
Total expenditure £3.04m £3.65m £2.54m £2.08m £1.66m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £881.99k £881.99k £614.06k £866.64k £1.50m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.12m £1.57m £1.14m £1.15m £125.72k
Income - Other trading activities £360.32k £463.46k £245.13k £148.53k £106.69k
Income - Charitable activities £1.56m £1.64m £939.27k £646.20k £159.47k
Income - Endowments £1.13k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.13k £1.06k £3.93k £7.91k £2.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £9.05k £0 £2.23m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.72m £3.23m £2.31m £1.91m £1.55m
Expenditure - Raising funds £314.40k £426.22k £236.03k £170.62k £112.83k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £1.32m £39.13k £34.74k £36.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0