DEEPING ST JAMES UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 248848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £118.39k £107.05k £114.05k £227.07k £260.80k
Total expenditure £76.50k £104.71k £104.92k £110.89k £105.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k