DEEPING ST JAMES UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 248848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS KATE SHINKINS Trustee 21 May 2015 None on record
TREVOR ALWYN RALPH HARWOOD Trustee 10 May 2017 None on record
MRS JUDY STEVENS Trustee 21 May 2015 None on record
CAROL ANN PRECEY Trustee 13 July 2016 None on record
Christine Halls Trustee 11 September 2019 None on record
Steve Goodchild Trustee 11 May 2016 None on record
Rev Mark Robert Williams Trustee 11 September 2019 None on record
GRAHAM THOMPSON Chair 14 January 2015 None on record
PETER FRANCIS WARD Trustee 14 January 2015 None on record
LES BULLOCK Trustee 08 January 2014 None on record