TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH BROTHER SERVANTS OF THE BLESSED VIRGIN SERVITE FATHERS

Charity number: 249148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £918.97k £978.47k £1.05m £960.76k £984.04k
Total expenditure £795.01k £831.78k £901.37k £912.35k £880.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £149.09k £278.74k £327.71k £234.55k £144.76k
Income - Other trading activities £189.81k £248.01k £202.81k £319.67k £370.04k
Income - Charitable activities £509.13k £364.02k £404.82k £275.98k £321.24k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £70.80k £85.85k £105.25k £101.73k £105.35k
Income - Other £144 £1.86k £12.74k £28.83k £42.64k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £71.65k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £780.01k £813.73k £901.37k £912.35k £880.29k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £18.05k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £15.00k £15.40k £40.13k £16.30k £14.76k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £18.05k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0