Trustees THE NORWICH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE LIMITED

Charity number: 249318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Jeffries Chair 20 March 2021
None on record
The Ven Catherine Dobson Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
The Ven Keith James Trustee 04 April 2022
THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Matthew Price Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Paul Cracknell Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
The Rt Revd Alan Winton Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Virginia Edgecombe Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Patricia Temple-Crowe Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Rev Stephen Thorp Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Thompson Zulu Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Lindsey Rix Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
The Rt Revd Jane Steen Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Mark Allbrook Trustee 06 October 2021
None on record
Revd. Dr. Patrick Richmond Trustee 19 December 2019
None on record
Rt Revd Graham Usher Trustee 17 June 2019
CHURCH COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND
Received: On time
Kandara Rachelle KAMMOUN Trustee 15 October 2018
None on record
REV CANON SIMON STOKES Trustee 11 February 2016
SPROWSTON YOUTH ENGAGEMENT PROJECT
Recently registered
MUSIC4ALL NORWICH
Overdue by 70 days
SPROWSTON YOUTH ENGAGEMENT PROJECT
Received: On time
Susan Gail Martin Trustee 11 February 2016
None on record
Angela Shireen Robson Trustee 21 October 2014
THE JULIAN OF NORWICH PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
The Ven STEVEN JAMES BETTS Trustee
ANNE FRENCH MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE DIOCESE OF NORWICH CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
CAPTAIN ANTHONY MERVYN POULTER Trustee
None on record