Financial history NORFOLK RECORD SOCIETY

Charity number: 249331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £6.83k £6.82k £8.78k £7.25k £10.54k
Total expenditure £6.76k £5.84k £7.86k £7.84k £7.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A