THE CHELMSFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 249505
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Gladys Horton Trustee 01 May 2013 None on record
Rt Revd Peter Hill Trustee 25 July 2014 None on record
The Venerable ELIZABETH SNOWDEN Trustee 13 March 2016
ARCHDEACON BURNEY'S CHARITY Received: On time
JILLIAN SARAH LEONARD MBA Trustee 15 January 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL, WOODFORD BRIDGE Received: On time
Dr RICHARD FORD FREEMAN Trustee 18 December 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SAFFRON WALDEN Received: On time
VEVET NORINE DEER Trustee 03 November 2012 None on record
Revd Canon Vanessa Anne Herrick BA MA LTCL Trustee 24 September 2017 None on record
The Right Rev John Perumbalath Trustee 15 September 2013 None on record
RONALD VICTOR JAMES MC LERNON Trustee 03 November 2012 None on record
The Venerable Ruth Janet Patten Trustee 17 November 2018
DYNAMIC NEW ANGLIAN NETWORKS Received: On time
THE REVEREND DOCTOR GEORGE RICHARDS' CHARITY FOR POOR CLERGYMEN Received: On time
THE DEDHAM ECCLESIASTICAL LECTURESHIP Received: On time
ARCHDEACON BURNEY'S CHARITY Received: On time
Rev LOUISE MARGARET WILLIAMS Trustee 17 July 2013 None on record
MARY ELIZABETH MOORE Trustee 03 November 2012
GENERAL TRUST FUND OF THE CHURCH UNION Received: On time
THE ROMFORD COUNTY HIGH SCHOOL 21ST BIRTHDAY LEAVING EXHIBITION TRUST FUND Received: On time
ROBERT IAN HAMMOND Trustee
AFFIRMING CATHOLICISM Received: On time
Harold JOHN WINTERBOTHAM MA Trustee 15 January 2016
ST JAMES' WITH ST LUKE'S PRE-SCHOOL Overdue by 303 days
THE REVD CANON MICHAEL JOHN LODGE Trustee 19 March 2017
ARCHDEACON BURNEY'S CHARITY Received: On time
Rt Revd Roger Anthony Brett Morris Trustee 25 July 2014
INNERVATION TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
The Very Revd Nicholas James Henshall Trustee 02 February 2014
THOMAS JOHN DEEKS CRAMPHORN Received: On time
Isabel Adcock Trustee 22 August 2014
ROBERT TAILLER (OR TAYLOR) Received: On time
THE VENERABLE ELWIN WESLEY COCKETT Trustee
THE REVEREND DOCTOR GEORGE RICHARDS' CHARITY FOR POOR CLERGYMEN Received: On time
FOREST SCHOOL, ESSEX Received: On time
ARCHDEACON BURNEY'S CHARITY Received: On time
Canon Dean Gillespie Trustee 15 August 2017 None on record
ROGER JAMES ENNALS Trustee 02 March 2016 None on record
Percy William Cecil Lomax Chair 09 November 2013 None on record