THE EXETER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE

Charity number: 249798
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.59m £15.64m £15.33m £15.18m £16.51m
Total expenditure £13.38m £14.63m £14.39m £12.91m £14.27m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £99.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £10.53m £10.50m £11.18m £11.67m £11.21m
Income - Other trading activities £1.37m £1.52m £1.48m £1.44m £1.33m
Income - Charitable activities £1.30m £905.00k £824.00k £756.00k £607.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.05m £1.31m £1.39m £1.32m £1.33m
Income - Other £332.31k £1.40m £460.00k £0 £2.03m
Income - Legacies £10.40k £105.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £13.10m £14.36m £14.10m £12.64m £14.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £281.62k £260.00k £290.00k £261.00k £229.00k
Expenditure - Governance £137.62k £131.00k £139.00k £147.00k £127.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.18m £1.20m £1.06m £1.51m £1.12m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £36.00k £73.00k £30.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £17.00k £0 £2.00k £0