Financial history YWCA OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 249895
Charity reporting is overdue by 195 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £11.64k £9.78k £18.08k £14.89k £17.45k
Total expenditure £15.76k £9.00k £4.92k £6.21k £11.66k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A