Governing document THE BRITISH SOCIETY OF RHEOLOGY
Charity number: 249967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/09/1966 AS AMENDED ON 15/04/2009 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 19 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 11 APR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 13 MAY 2020 AS AMENDED ON 05 APR 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF SCIENTIFIC INQUIRY AND THE DIFFUSION TO THE PUBLIC OF KNOWLEDGE CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF PURE AND APPLIED RHEOLOGY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NATIONAL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.