Trustees THE BRITISH SOCIETY OF RHEOLOGY
Charity number: 249967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Maria Charalambides | Chair | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Ness | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anders Aufderhorst-Roberts | Trustee | 04 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prof Richard Stuart Graham | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Francesco Del Guidice | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Lewis Thompson | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Simon John Cox | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire McIlroy | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Monica S N Oliveira | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Clarke | Trustee | 19 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard L Watson | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Manlio Tassieri | Trustee | 26 March 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.