Financial history THE MOTHERS' UNION - DIOCESE OF YORK

Charity number: 249998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £64.54k £67.92k £64.34k £38.16k £35.65k
Total expenditure £76.87k £62.14k £55.11k £30.72k £62.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A