Accounts and annual returns MOUNTAIN ASH YMCA

Charity number: 250106
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 113 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 June 2022 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 July 2022 173 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 June 2022 496 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 June 2022 862 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required